Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Representative Conley added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Rozar added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/18/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Introduced |