Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 189
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/22/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Representative Madison added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|