Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 07/07/2023 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senators Wanggaard and Hutton added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Introduced |