Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Representative Armstrong added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/28/2023 | Representative O'Connor withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/28/2023 | Representative Green added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Representative Baldeh added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/11/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Senator Larson added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 12/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 12/04/2023 | Representative Rettinger added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business | ||
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Introduced |