Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Published 3-15-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-14-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 120
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-11-2024 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Knodl
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Knodl
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|