Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Representative Stubbs withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Representative Subeck withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |