Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Published 4-6-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 4-5-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-30-2023 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 67, Noes 30
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neubauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Agard, Taylor, Hesselbein, Larson, L. Johnson, Roys and Smith
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|