Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Cabral-Guevara and Hesselbein | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |