Senate | 03/22/2024 | Published 3-22-2024 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 127 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Read a third time and concurred in | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Read | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roys | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |