Senate | 05/11/2023 | Published 5-11-2023 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-10-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 10 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Presented to the Governor on 5-4-2023 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 80, Noes 18 | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 8 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Introduced |