Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Representatives Andraca and Cabrera added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senator Ballweg added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Representatives Subeck and Stubbs added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Introduced |