Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |