Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Senator Agard added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |