Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 09/06/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/06/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/01/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/08/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Representative Tranel added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Representatives Steffen and Rettinger added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Representative Palmeri added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Representative VanderMeer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Representative Bare added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced |