Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Introduced |