Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Representative Rozar added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Representative Wittke added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Introduced |