Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Published 3-28-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 242
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Utilities and Technology, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2023
|
Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|