Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Representative Myers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/21/2023 | Representative Palmeri added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Introduced |