Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Introduced |