Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Representative Green added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Introduced |