Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Representative Jacobson withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson and Smith | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | Senator Cabral-Guevara added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Introduced |