Senate | 02/02/2024 | Published 2-3-2024 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Report approved by the Governor on 2-2-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 93 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Presented to the Governor on 2-1-2024 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Report correctly enrolled | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Received from Assembly concurred in | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 96, Noes 1 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Introduced |