Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Published 12-7-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 62
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2023
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|