House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 31, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senator Cowles added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/26/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/26/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|