Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Introduced |