Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Representative Doyle added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Introduced |