Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Hutton | ||
Senate | 09/06/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/06/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 3 | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 08/22/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Introduced |