Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Representative Donovan added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Introduced |