Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 136
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|