Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Introduced |