Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 6, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 6, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Representative Jacobson withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Introduced |