Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | LRB correction | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Introduced |