Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Withdrawn from committee on Agriculture and Tourism and rereferred to committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senator Testin added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Representative Behnke withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Introduced |