Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Published 3-7-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-6-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 103
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2024 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:38 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Placed at the foot of the calendar of 2-20-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stafsholt
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|