Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senator Hutton added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Introduced |