Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 4, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced |