Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 62, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:52 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tomczyk
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|