Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stafsholt | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Representative Brooks added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced |