Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Published 4-4-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2023 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 85, Noes 12
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senator Hutton added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Senator Testin added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|