Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Introduced |