Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Representative J. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Introduced |