Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Introduced |