Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wimberger | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Introduced |