LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Wisconsin WI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB96
Action History
WI
Wisconsin Senate Bill SB96
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Senate Bill SB96
Action History
Senate
04/15/2024
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Senate
01/10/2024
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
Senate
03/22/2023
Representatives Gundrum and O'Connor added as cosponsors
Senate
03/17/2023
Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
Senate
03/01/2023
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
Senate
03/01/2023
Introduced