Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Representative Behnke added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Representative Gundrum added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tomczyk | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Introduced |