Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Representatives Summerfield, Rettinger, Schraa and Tittl added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senator James added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Introduced |