Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Failed to pass partial veto notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Published 3-1-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor with partial veto on 2-29-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 100
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 2-23-2024 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
LRB correction (Senate Amendment 2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 2-13-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Stroebel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|