Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Introduced |