House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-15-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Received from Senate passed notwithstanding the objections of the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Passed notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, Ayes 22, Noes 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Rules suspended and taken up
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 12-6-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Representative Bodden added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and rereferred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|