Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Published 4-10-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 4-9-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 272
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Representative Vining added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:58 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Representative Madison added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Representative Clancy added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Representative S. Johnson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senators Spreitzer, Agard and Carpenter added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Senator Larson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Representatives Mursau, Edming, Snyder and Goeben added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|